Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2627 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16033 Week
» 69049 Month
» 188576 Year
» 3215429 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13169 |
02/09/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3169 |
21/02/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08104 |
06/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/09/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/09/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13169 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3169 |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08104 |
|
|
04/07/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08104 from Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
17/03/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|