Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 296 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18099 Week
» 71115 Month
» 190642 Year
» 3217495 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3161 |
27/09/1965 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86249 |
30/04/1974 |
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
27/09/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3161 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3453 |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GS) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
30/04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86249 |
|
|
10/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86249 |
|
|
31/10/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J T Lanscapes: at MoD Caerwent |
|
|