Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 308 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18111 Week
» 71127 Month
» 190654 Year
» 3217507 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3159 |
14/07/1966 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86028 |
08/01/1974 |
TOPS (86/3) |
86328 |
11/05/1980 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86428 |
21/02/1986 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86628 |
05/10/1990 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
14/07/1966 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
14/07/1966 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/07/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3159 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3740 |
|
|
08/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86028 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
11/05/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86328 |
|
|
21/02/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86428 |
|
|
05/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86628 |
|
|