Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1504 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14910 Week
» 67926 Month
» 187453 Year
» 3214306 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3154 |
21/05/1966 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86042 |
21/12/1973 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86255 |
25/04/1975 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
21/05/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/1998 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
21/05/1966 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/05/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3154 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3735 |
|
|
21/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86042 |
|
|
25/04/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86255 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
08/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86255 |
|
|
01/09/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Easco: at Immingham Railfreight Terminal |
|
|