Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 868 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14274 Week
» 67290 Month
» 186817 Year
» 3213670 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3146 |
02/04/1966 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86017 |
29/08/1973 |
TOPS (86/3) |
86317 |
31/12/1979 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86417 |
13/03/1985 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
02/04/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/2001 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1976 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/12/1976 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
02/04/1966 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
12/1976 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
04/12/1976 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/04/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3146 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3727 |
|
|
29/08/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86017 |
|
|
12/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
04/12/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
31/12/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86317 |
|
|
13/03/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86417 |
|
|
09/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86417 |
|
|
01/11/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|