Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1337 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19140 Week
» 72156 Month
» 191683 Year
» 3218536 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3145 |
22/03/1966 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86014 |
24/08/1973 |
TOPS (86/3) |
86314 |
29/09/1981 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86414 |
28/07/1986 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86614 |
24/11/1990 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
22/03/1966 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
29/09/1981 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
22/03/1966 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
29/09/1981 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3145 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3726 |
|
|
24/08/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86014 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
29/09/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
29/09/1981 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86314 |
|
|
28/07/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86414 |
|
|
24/11/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86614 |
|
|