Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3394 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16800 Week
» 69816 Month
» 189343 Year
» 3216196 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3141 |
16/02/1966 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86208 |
04/08/1973 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
07/03/1979 |
City of Chester |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
16/02/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/2000 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
16/02/1966 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/02/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3141 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3722 |
|
|
04/08/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86208 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
07/03/1979 |
Naming |
Named 'City of Chester' at Chester Station |
|
|
03/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86208 |
|
|
31/07/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Sandbach Car and Commercial Dismantlers: at Crewe EMD |
|
|