Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2960 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16366 Week
» 69382 Month
» 188909 Year
» 3215762 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
111 |
m/e |
08/1908 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
314 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1908 |
ABDR |
|
Aberdare |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
ABDR |
Aberdare |
m/e |
31/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 111 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5133 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 314 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aberdare (ABDR) |
|
|
08/12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 314 from Aberdare (ABDR) |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|