Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1140 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18943 Week
» 71959 Month
» 191486 Year
» 3218339 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13136 |
25/12/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3136 |
30/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08101 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/12/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/12/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13136 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3136 |
|
|
02/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
15/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08101 |
|
|
17/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08101 from Lincoln (LN) |
|
|
03/11/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|