Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 982 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19893 Week
» 84847 Month
» 287511 Year
» 3314364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13135 |
27/11/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3135 |
31/12/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08100 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/11/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/11/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13135 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
31/12/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3135 |
|
|
07/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08100 |
|
|
19/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08100 from Cambridge (CA) |
|
|
09/03/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|