Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1687 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15093 Week
» 68109 Month
» 187636 Year
» 3214489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13132 |
30/10/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3132 |
18/06/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08097 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1975 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/10/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 03/1975 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13132 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
18/06/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3132 |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08097 |
|
|
03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
11/03/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08097 from Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
06/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|