Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13131 |
31/08/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3131 |
28/12/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08096 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1975 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/08/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 03/1975 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13131 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3131 |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
18/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08096 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
09/08/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
09/09/1984 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
20/04/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|