Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 629 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14035 Week
» 67051 Month
» 186578 Year
» 3213431 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13130 |
31/08/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3130 |
30/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08095 |
02/02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1975 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/08/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 03/1975 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13130 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
01/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3130 |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08095 |
|
|
03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
27/02/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08095 from March (MR) |
|
|
09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|