Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2198 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20001 Week
» 73017 Month
» 192544 Year
» 3219397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3129 |
24/11/1965 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86205 |
13/06/1973 |
TOPS (86/5a) |
86503 |
01/1989 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86205 |
01/1990 |
TOPS (86/7) |
86701 |
01/2008 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
24/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
30/09/2008 |
Time in Service |
42 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
24/11/1965 |
|
Unknown - please contact administrator! |
w/e |
12/06/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/09/2008 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
24/11/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/11/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3129 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
12/06/1971 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
13/06/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86205 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
01/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86503 |
|
|
01/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86205 |
|
|
01/2008 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86701 |
|
|
30/09/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86701 |
|
|