Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 897 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18700 Week
» 71716 Month
» 191243 Year
» 3218096 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3128 |
23/11/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86013 |
31/08/1973 |
TOPS (86/3) |
86313 |
14/11/1980 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86413 |
30/03/1985 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86613 |
03/12/1989 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
23/11/1965 |
Status |
In Service |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
23/11/1965 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
23/11/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/11/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3128 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
31/08/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86013 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
14/11/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86313 |
|
|
30/03/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86413 |
|
|
03/12/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86613 |
|
|