Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 917 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14323 Week
» 67339 Month
» 186866 Year
» 3213719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3127 |
26/10/1965 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86240 |
31/03/1974 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
03/04/1979 |
Bishop Eric Treacy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
26/10/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/2002 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
26/10/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/10/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3127 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
31/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86240 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
03/04/1979 |
Naming |
Named 'Bishop Eric Treacy' by Mrs Treacy at Penrith Station |
|
|
10/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86240 |
|
|
28/04/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|