Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2635 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16041 Week
» 69057 Month
» 188584 Year
» 3215437 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3126 |
m/e |
06/1905 |
Great Western Railway (51xx) |
5126 |
m/e |
08/1929 |
Great Western Railway (81xx) |
8105 |
m/e |
04/1939 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
3100/5100 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
152 |
Works Number |
2091 |
To Service |
During 06/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 20/06/1957 |
Service Life |
52 yrs , 20 dys |
Total Mileage |
418,327 |
Information |
Mileage since rebuild to 81xx |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1911 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3126 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2091 |
|
|
07/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1929 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5126 |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weston-super-Mare (brd) |
|
|
04/1939 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8105 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) |
|
|
14/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
10/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
31/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
20/06/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8105 |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|