Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3418 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16824 Week
» 69840 Month
» 189367 Year
» 3216220 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3121 |
25/09/1965 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86241 |
31/03/1974 |
TOPS (86/5a) |
86508 |
01/1989 |
TOPS (86/2 Revert) |
86241 |
01/1990 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
29/03/1979 |
Glenfiddich |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
25/09/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/2000 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
25/09/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3121 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
31/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86241 |
|
|
29/03/1979 |
Naming |
Named 'Glenfiddich' |
|
|
01/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86508 |
|
|
01/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86241 |
|
|
01/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86241 |
|
|
21/02/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Sandbach Car and Commercial Dismantlers: at Crewe EMD |
|
|