Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4047 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17453 Week
» 70469 Month
» 189996 Year
» 3216849 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3120 |
25/09/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86019 |
04/09/1973 |
TOPS (86/3) |
86319 |
31/12/1979 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86419 |
19/03/1986 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
25/09/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/1999 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
25/09/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3120 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
04/09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86019 |
|
|
31/12/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86319 |
|
|
19/03/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86419 |
|
|
03/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86419 |
|
|
01/03/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Sandbach Car and Commercial Dismantlers: at Crewe EMD |
|
|