Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3501 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17544 Week
» 82498 Month
» 285162 Year
» 3312015 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3119 |
25/09/1965 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86229 |
03/01/1974 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
24/06/1983 |
Sir John Betjeman |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
25/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
30/09/2008 |
Time in Service |
43 yrs , 5 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
25/09/1965 |
|
Unknown - please contact administrator! |
w/e |
27/11/1971 |
ACL |
London Midland - Western Lines |
w/e |
04/12/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/09/2008 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
25/09/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3119 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
27/11/1971 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
04/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Midland - Western Lines (ACL) |
|
|
08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
03/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86229 |
|
|
24/06/1983 |
Naming |
Named 'Sir John Betjeman' by Sir John Betjeman, Poet Laureate at St. Pancras Station |
|
|
30/09/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86229 |
|
|