Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2572 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 7725 Week
» 142541 Month
» 345205 Year
» 3372058 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1159 |
m/e |
01/1876 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Armstrong |
Class |
517 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
Order Number |
W |
Works Number |
282 |
To Service |
During 01/1876 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 22/08/1947 |
Service Life |
71 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1876 |
OXF |
|
Oxford |
4w/e |
16/11/1935 |
OXF |
|
Oxford |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
22/08/1947 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
OXF |
Oxford |
m/e |
31/08/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1896 |
15' 6" wheelbase |
03/1896 |
Diagram R4 boiler fitted |
09/1925 |
Diagram BR4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1876 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1159 Built at Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road), Works Number 282 Diagram R3 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1896 |
Modification |
Diagram R4 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1896 |
Modification |
Modification: 15' 6" wheelbase |
|
|
09/1925 |
Modification |
Diagram BR4 boiler fitted |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (OXF) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxford (OXF) |
|
|
22/08/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1159 |
|
|