Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 802 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19713 Week
» 84667 Month
» 287331 Year
» 3314184 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3115 |
27/09/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86003 |
17/05/1973 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86403 |
13/06/1986 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86603 |
17/10/1990 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
27/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
09/1999 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
01/11/2005 |
Cut At |
C F Booth Rotherham |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
27/09/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/1999 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
27/09/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3115 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
17/05/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86003 |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
13/06/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86403 |
|
|
17/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86603 |
|
|
09/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86603 |
|
|
01/11/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|