Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2195 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19998 Week
» 73014 Month
» 192541 Year
» 3219394 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3114 |
27/09/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86020 |
06/10/1973 |
TOPS (86/3) |
86320 |
13/04/1980 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86420 |
01/12/1984 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86620 |
20/05/1989 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
27/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
09/2005 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
01/06/2007 |
Cut At |
Ron Hull Jr. Rotherham |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
27/09/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/2005 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
12/02/1976 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
27/09/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
12/02/1976 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3114 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86020 |
|
|
12/02/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
13/04/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86320 |
|
|
01/12/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86420 |
|
|
20/05/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86620 |
|
|
09/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86620 |
|
|
01/06/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|