Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1921 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19724 Week
» 72740 Month
» 192267 Year
» 3219120 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13111 |
25/03/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3111 |
11/11/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08086 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/03/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13111 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
11/11/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3111 |
|
|
29/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (2G) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08086 |
|
|
11/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
25/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
03/08/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08086 from Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
01/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|