Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 96 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17899 Week
» 70915 Month
» 190442 Year
» 3217295 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13106 |
04/03/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3106 |
21/05/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08081 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/1970 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1972 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/03/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 05/1970 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
12/1972 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/03/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13106 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
21/05/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3106 |
|
|
30/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (2D) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (2A) |
|
|
20/09/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
27/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08081 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
13/09/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
06/04/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08081 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
07/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|