Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1205 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14611 Week
» 67627 Month
» 187154 Year
» 3214007 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3104 |
27/09/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86010 |
25/07/1973 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86410 |
13/08/1986 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86610 |
24/07/1990 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
27/09/1965 |
Status |
In Service |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
08/1972 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1975 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/12/1975 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
27/09/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
08/1972 |
xeh |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating, Headlight |
|
|
12/1975 |
xeh |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating, Headlight |
|
|
03/12/1975 |
xeh |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating, Headlight |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3104 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
25/07/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86010 |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GS) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
03/12/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
13/08/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86410 |
|
|
24/07/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86610 |
|
|