Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4347 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13921 Week
» 78875 Month
» 281539 Year
» 3308392 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13104 |
23/02/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3104 |
26/01/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08079 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1970 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/02/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
01/1970 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/02/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13104 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
26/01/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3104 |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
21/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
07/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
14/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
18/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08079 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CH) |
|
|
04/12/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08079 from Chester West (CH) |
|
|
05/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|