Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2788 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16194 Week
» 69210 Month
» 188737 Year
» 3215590 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3103 |
21/08/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86004 |
19/05/1973 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86404 |
24/01/1986 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86604 |
27/09/1990 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
21/08/1965 |
Status |
In Service |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
21/08/1965 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
21/08/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3103 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86004 |
|
|
24/01/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86404 |
|
|
27/09/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86604 |
|
|