Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4211 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17617 Week
» 70633 Month
» 190160 Year
» 3217013 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3102 |
21/08/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86009 |
23/10/1973 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86409 |
19/11/1986 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86609 |
30/06/1989 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
21/08/1965 |
Status |
In Service |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
21/08/1965 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
21/08/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3102 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
23/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86009 |
|
|
19/11/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86409 |
|
|
30/06/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86609 |
|
|