Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13100 |
29/01/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3100 |
28/02/1959 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
29/01/1955 to Norwood Junction (75C) |
Withdrawn |
01/10/1972 |
Time in Service |
17 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/01/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/01/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13100 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
20/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
28/02/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3100 |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
30/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
08/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
18/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
25/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
01/10/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3100 |
|
|