Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2571 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15977 Week
» 68993 Month
» 188520 Year
» 3215373 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13099 |
22/01/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3099 |
22/08/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/01/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/01/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13099 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
20/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
07/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
22/08/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3099 |
|
|
10/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
08/10/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3099 |
|
|
08/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by P Woods (Shipbreaking): Queenborough |
|
|