Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1293 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19096 Week
» 72112 Month
» 191639 Year
» 3218492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Type B) |
E3302 |
Not applied |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3097 |
27/01/1964 |
TOPS (Tops) |
81022 |
24/12/1973 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
01/04/1962 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
12/1973 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1959 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 3302 but not taken up |
|
|
27/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3097 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company, Works Number 1107 |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
24/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 81022 |
|
|
29/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GW) |
|
|
10/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 81022 |
|
|
07/11/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by A Hampton: at Crewe Works |
|
|