Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 2426 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15832 Week
» 68848 Month
» 188375 Year
» 3215228 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13097 |
15/01/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3097 |
13/09/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/01/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/01/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13097 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
20/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
13/09/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3097 |
|
|
31/05/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3097 |
|
|
12/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|