Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 174 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17977 Week
» 70993 Month
» 190520 Year
» 3217373 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3096 |
29/06/1963 |
Pre TOPS (Type B) |
E3301 |
04/10/1963 |
TOPS (Tops) |
81021 |
05/1974 |
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
04/10/1963 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/06/1963 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3096 |
|
|
04/10/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3301 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company, Works Number 1106 |
|
|
01/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GS) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 81021 |
|
|
29/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GW) |
|
|
28/04/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 81021 |
|
|
05/10/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|