Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1113 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18916 Week
» 71932 Month
» 191459 Year
» 3218312 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13083 |
09/10/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3083 |
28/02/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08068 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/10/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/10/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13083 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
28/02/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3083 |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
27/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08068 |
|
|
06/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
13/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
28/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
17/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08068 from Tyseley (TS) |
|
|
10/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|