Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1793 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7577 Week
» 28966 Month
» 148493 Year
» 3175346 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13079 |
23/01/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3079 |
07/09/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08064 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
23/01/1954 to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
Withdrawn |
23/12/1984 |
Time in Service |
30 yrs , 11 mths |
Cut Up |
03/1985 |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/01/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/01/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13079 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3079 |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08064 |
|
|
07/12/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
09/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
02/08/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
23/12/1984 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
03/1985 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|