Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1381 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19184 Week
» 72200 Month
» 191727 Year
» 3218580 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13078 |
23/01/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3078 |
02/11/1957 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/01/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/01/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13078 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3078 |
|
|
29/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
30/11/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3078 from Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|