Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1787 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15193 Week
» 68209 Month
» 187736 Year
» 3214589 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13076 |
23/01/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3076 |
22/02/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08062 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/01/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/01/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13076 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
22/02/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3076 |
|
|
08/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08062 |
|
|
30/09/1984 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
23/03/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|