Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 1593 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7377 Week
» 28766 Month
» 148293 Year
» 3175146 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13074 |
19/12/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3074 |
07/09/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08060 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13074 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3074 |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08060 |
|
|
24/06/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08060 from Lincoln (LN) |
|
|
30/06/1985 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|