Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2860 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16266 Week
» 69282 Month
» 188809 Year
» 3215662 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13071 |
21/11/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3071 |
10/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08057 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/11/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/11/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13071 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
20/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3071 |
|
|
09/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08057 |
|
|
28/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08057 from Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|