Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1373 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15416 Week
» 80370 Month
» 283034 Year
» 3309887 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13070 |
21/11/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3070 |
15/06/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08056 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/11/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/11/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13070 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3070 |
|
|
09/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
21/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08056 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Knottingley (KY) |
|
|
03/08/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08056 from Knottingley (KY) |
|
|
09/05/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|