Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3535 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16941 Week
» 69957 Month
» 189484 Year
» 3216337 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13061 |
22/08/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3061 |
09/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08048 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/08/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13061 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
09/05/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3061 |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08048 |
|
|
12/12/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08048 from Wath (WH) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|