06/05/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. |
SLS/195006 |
10/06/1950 |
Brighton Works |
On the occasion of the Works visit on Saturday, 10th June, the following were noted: e20001 (new livery), 31295 (lined), 31706, 32460, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34074, 34082 615 Squadron (30)272, 32636 (lined, waiting boiler), 42096 (tanks being fitted), 42097 (boiler in), frames up to 42102, frames of 34110, 77108/90570 (V.F.4924/43), 77359/90207, 90702, 77030/90127, and the works shunters 377S an 2235. Diesel 15203 was still outside after repair and repaint. The transfer of the 'W.D. 8F' proceeds apace; they were most useful on the Southern Region for maintaining quick goods working between the frequent passenger services (mostly electric), as they had a good turn of speed;, and they were used on empty stock and mixed trains. |
SLS/195007 |
03/03/1953 |
Brighton Works |
No. 80059, the first of ten new 2-6-4 tanks left the works on 3rd March; a further ten are also to be built in this 'year's programme. Engines under and awaiting repair include 30027, 30109, 30825/37, 30338, 30951/7, 32655. 30117 an 30919 have been through shops but have not been repainted. While DS515 was receiving attention here its place at Lancing was taken by 32636; 80060 was due on 2/3 but was not ready. An unusual visitor to the shed on 3rd March was 32113. |
SLS/195304 |
19/04/1958 |
Wainwright \"D\" |
I was on the footplate of a Wainwright 'D' 4-4-0 in April, 1958, although the class was officially extinct about two years ago. Our friend and member, Mr. W. E. Coney, has had plans and parts ready to restore Ashford-built No. 31737 to S.E.C.R. 737 in the Works there to all her one-time glory but, alas, authority to proceed is so far withheld and the veteran is becoming more rusty and forlorn in the open. In the busy Shops at Ashford new inside cylinders with steam chests, etc., are being turned out for both classes of Pacifics rebuilding at Eastleigh; also new cylinders and front ends for S.R. Moguls continuing to be modified there. ' Schools ' lately painted green include 30908 Westminster, 30927 Clifton. The ' oldest-of-all ' now, No. 32636, 1872-built Stroudley ' Terrier ' once named Fenchurch, sold by the L.B.S.C.R. to the Newhaven Harbour Company in 1898, purchased by the S.R. with the whole undertaking in 1927, is still at work in smart-lined black, shunting at St. Leonards, West Marina & Loco. Yds. or taking the Kent & East Sussex daily freight at the time of writing in Yds., it shared with the slightly younger sister OP '0-6-0T No. 32678 which had been in Isle of Wight stock, one at each end (as at hop-picking passenger time during recent Septembers) in hauling the Branch Line Society's 4-corridor special from Robertsbridge to Tenterden and back, ex-K.E.S.R., on April 12, while our A.G.M. was in progress at H.Q. One little tank alone had rather a struggle on account of priming to get the empty train up the climbs on the direct London line from St. Leonards to Battle at the start of the afternoon. |
SLS/195805 |
01/11/1958 |
Terrier in action |
The Drewry diesel shunter on the K.E.S.R. No. 11123 has been out of action several times recently, so the 'oldest veteran ' ex-L.B.S.C.R. 'Terrier' 0-6-0T No. 32636, built 1872, has been in charge again on a number of days on the Kent & East Sussex line freight train between Robertsbridge and Tenderden, also the early morning Crowhurst-Bexhill West van trip, plus some Hastings shunting. |
SLS/195812 |
25/02/1962 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) |
Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. |
SLS/196204 |