Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 844 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6628 Week
» 28017 Month
» 147544 Year
» 3174397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D306 |
13/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40106 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
13/10/1960 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
21/04/1983 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys |
Information |
Bogie cracks |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
13/10/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/10/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
04/06/1964 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
10/07/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D306 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40106 |
|
|
26/06/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
07/08/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
21/04/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40106 |
|
|