Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 316 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18119 Week
» 71135 Month
» 190662 Year
» 3217515 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13059 |
11/09/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3059 |
30/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08046 |
07/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/09/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/09/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13059 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
30/05/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3059 |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
18/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
27/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
17/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (16F) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08046 |
|
|
18/05/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08046 from Bury (BV) |
|
|