Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1308 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19111 Week
» 72127 Month
» 191654 Year
» 3218507 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13058 |
11/09/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3058 |
11/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08045 |
07/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/09/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/09/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13058 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
11/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3058 |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
11/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08045 |
|
|
04/07/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08045 from Toton (TO) |
|
|
15/12/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|