Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16173 Week
» 69189 Month
» 188716 Year
» 3215569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3054 |
30/10/1961 |
TOPS (Tops) |
82008 |
01/01/1973 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
27/05/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
30/10/1961 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
27/05/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3054 Built at Associated Electrical Industries, Works Number 1029 |
|
|
27/05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/01/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 82008 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
01/12/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 82008 |
|
|