Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2528 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15934 Week
» 68950 Month
» 188477 Year
» 3215330 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13053 |
19/06/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3053 |
26/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08040 |
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/06/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/06/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13053 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
25/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3053 |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (21F) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
19/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
11/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 08040 but not taken up |
|
|
10/06/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3053 from Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
10/1975 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|