Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3491 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16897 Week
» 69913 Month
» 189440 Year
» 3216293 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3049 |
15/08/1960 |
TOPS (Tops) |
82003 |
05/1974 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
22/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
15/08/1960 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
22/12/1971 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3049 Built at Associated Electrical Industries, Works Number 1024 |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Midland - Western Lines (LMW) |
|
|
22/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 82003 |
|
|
17/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 82003 |
|
|
17/06/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|