Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 474 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19385 Week
» 84339 Month
» 287003 Year
» 3313856 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3048 |
03/08/1960 |
TOPS (Tops) |
82002 |
01/01/1973 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
03/08/1960 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
11/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3048 Built at Associated Electrical Industries, Works Number 1023 |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Midland - Western Lines (LMW) |
|
|
11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/01/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 82002 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Crewe Electric (CE) |
|
|
19/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 82002 |
|
|
30/11/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|